Сайт поиска работы №1 в Украине
- Файл
Ігор
Senior associate
- Город:
- Киев
Контактная информация
Соискатель указал телефон .
Фамилия, контакты и фото доступны только для зарегистрированных работодателей. Чтобы получить доступ к личным данным кандидатов, войдите как работодатель или зарегистрируйтесь.
Получить контакты этого кандидата можно на странице https://www.work.ua/resumes/10711954/
Загруженный файл
Это резюме размещено в виде файла. Эта версия для быстрого просмотра может быть хуже, чем оригинал резюме.
Igor O. Pogorelskyi, Retired Colonel
52/3 Y. Zdanovskoi Street, Apt. 39 Mobile phone: [открыть контакты ](см. выше в блоке «контактная информация»)
03191 Kyiv, Ukraine [открыть контакты ](см. выше в блоке «контактная информация»)
Profile:
Birth date and place: 1964-03-28, Vinnytsia, Ukraine
Marital status: married
Citizenship: Ukraine
Education:
September 1994 – June 1996.
Master’s degree in Defence Management in International Relations, Academy of the Armed Forces of Ukraine, Kyiv. Qualification of operative level officer.
September 1981 – June 1986.
Engineer’s degree in Computer Assisted Equipment Technical Support, Military Engineer Institute named after Mozhayskyi, St Petersburg, Russia. Qualification of electronic engineer.
September 1971 – June 1981.
Comprehensive school, Vinnytsia.
Training:
February – May 2012
International Business Security Course, Kyiv (sponsored by the Government of Norway)
January – June 2009.
German Course and Program in Advanced Security Studies, Marshall Centre, Germany
September – December 2007.
German Course, Language Institute, Defence Academy, Vienna, Austria
January – February 2002.
CIMIC Course, Ottawa, Canada
June – July 2000.
Advanced Peacekeeping Course, Pearson Peacekeeping Centre, Canada
Work experience:
11/2013-till now
Senior Project Manager, Contact Directorate, State Company “Ukrspecexport”
• Concluded and managed contracts on provision of military aviation goods and services to some countries;
• Prepared and participated in the different level talks on the relevant issues both in Ukraine and abroad;
• Provided the Directorate and the Company management with the analytical materials on the performing contracts and propositions on prospective projects;
• Conducted correspondence with the foreign counterparts and the related ministries and agencies of Ukraine on the relevant matters;
• Supervised and coordinated the subcontractors’ activity within the effective contacts both in Ukraine and in the customers, countries.
08/2012-12/2012
Senior Project Manager, Demining Subdivision, State Enterprise “Ukroboronservice”
• Participated in coordination of Ukrainian deminers activities within international demining missions abroad sponsored by IOs;
• Provided the Subdivision and the Enterprise management with analytical materials regarding possibility of participation in other international demining missions.
Since 01/2011
Retired
09/2006-12/2010
Chief of Section, External Relation Directorate, MOD of Ukraine (Kyiv)
• Was responsible for cooperation with European countries and NATO
• Prepared and participated in the different level talks on the issues of the bilateral cooperation both in Ukraine and abroad
• Provided the higher commanders with the analytical materials
• Conducted correspondence with the foreign counterparts and the related ministries and agencies of Ukraine on the matters of international cooperation
• Supervised the subordinates’ activity on the above mentioned and other issues
01/2005-08/2006
Deputy Chief of Peacekeeping Section, Euro-Atlantic Integration Directorate, General Staff of the Armed Forces of Ukraine (Kyiv)
• Monitored activity of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents and personal
• Took part at the training and rotation of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents and personal
• Provided reconnaissance for the future deployment, took part in the deployment and inspection of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents (Lebanon, Sierra Leone, Kosovo, Liberia)
• Participated in the different level talks on the peacekeeping issues
• Provided the higher commanders with the analytical materials
• Conducted correspondence with the related ministries and agencies of Ukraine as well as with the UN DPKO and NATO on the matters of peacekeeping
12/2003-12/2004
Liaison Officer, US CENTCOM (Tampa, Fl, USA)
• Monitored the situation in the area of responsibility
• Coordinated the rotation of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingent in Iraq, evacuation of wounded in action and killed in action
• Participated in the briefings and other US CENTCOM coalition’s events
• Provided the higher commanders with the analytical information and recommendations
08/2000-11/2003
Senior Officer, Peacekeeping Section, Euro-Atlantic Cooperation Directorate, General Staff of the Armed Forces of Ukraine (Kyiv)
• Monitored activity of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents and personal
• Took part at the conducting of the rotation of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents and personal
• Took part at the conducting of the deployment and inspections of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents
• Participated in the different level talks on the peacekeeping issues
07/1996-06/2000
Senior Officer, Treaty Implementation Analytical Section, Strategic Offence Arms Treaty Implementation Centre, 43rd Rocket Army (Kyiv)
• Monitored the fulfillment of the Treaty and related agreements
• Provided the higher commander with the analytical materials
• Organized working meeting with the officers of the US On-Site Inspection Agency, foreign (US and German) contractors and representatives from the related ministries and agencies of Ukraine
• Carried out customs clearance of import of the goods within the Cooperative Threat Reduction Program
01/1993-08/1994
Psychologist, Signal Centre, Air Forces of Ukraine (Vinnitsa)
• Did psychological research of the personnel
• Provided the higher commander with the recommendations
07/1986-12/1992
Different engineer positions, Space Launching Site Baykonur (Leninsk, Kazakhstan)
• Provided maintenance of electronic equipment
• Supervised duty technical shifts
Other skills:
Languages: Ukrainian and Russian – native languages;
English and German – fluent;
French – intermediate (French Institute in Kyiv).
Computer: Technically proficient in MS Word, Excel and PowerPoint.
Driving license: B Category.
Additional Information:
Personal qualities: honesty, responsibility, sociability, efficiency, high working capacity, leadership.
Hobbies: sports, theater, travelling, culture, politics.
Abroad trips experience: during my military and civilian career I travelled numerous times to the USA, Canada and almost all European countries, as well as some Asian (Kazakhstan, Lebanon, India, Israel, Pakistan and Iraq) and some African countries (Sierra-Leone and Liberia).
52/3 Y. Zdanovskoi Street, Apt. 39 Mobile phone: [
03191 Kyiv, Ukraine [
Profile:
Birth date and place: 1964-03-28, Vinnytsia, Ukraine
Marital status: married
Citizenship: Ukraine
Education:
September 1994 – June 1996.
Master’s degree in Defence Management in International Relations, Academy of the Armed Forces of Ukraine, Kyiv. Qualification of operative level officer.
September 1981 – June 1986.
Engineer’s degree in Computer Assisted Equipment Technical Support, Military Engineer Institute named after Mozhayskyi, St Petersburg, Russia. Qualification of electronic engineer.
September 1971 – June 1981.
Comprehensive school, Vinnytsia.
Training:
February – May 2012
International Business Security Course, Kyiv (sponsored by the Government of Norway)
January – June 2009.
German Course and Program in Advanced Security Studies, Marshall Centre, Germany
September – December 2007.
German Course, Language Institute, Defence Academy, Vienna, Austria
January – February 2002.
CIMIC Course, Ottawa, Canada
June – July 2000.
Advanced Peacekeeping Course, Pearson Peacekeeping Centre, Canada
Work experience:
11/2013-till now
Senior Project Manager, Contact Directorate, State Company “Ukrspecexport”
• Concluded and managed contracts on provision of military aviation goods and services to some countries;
• Prepared and participated in the different level talks on the relevant issues both in Ukraine and abroad;
• Provided the Directorate and the Company management with the analytical materials on the performing contracts and propositions on prospective projects;
• Conducted correspondence with the foreign counterparts and the related ministries and agencies of Ukraine on the relevant matters;
• Supervised and coordinated the subcontractors’ activity within the effective contacts both in Ukraine and in the customers, countries.
08/2012-12/2012
Senior Project Manager, Demining Subdivision, State Enterprise “Ukroboronservice”
• Participated in coordination of Ukrainian deminers activities within international demining missions abroad sponsored by IOs;
• Provided the Subdivision and the Enterprise management with analytical materials regarding possibility of participation in other international demining missions.
Since 01/2011
Retired
09/2006-12/2010
Chief of Section, External Relation Directorate, MOD of Ukraine (Kyiv)
• Was responsible for cooperation with European countries and NATO
• Prepared and participated in the different level talks on the issues of the bilateral cooperation both in Ukraine and abroad
• Provided the higher commanders with the analytical materials
• Conducted correspondence with the foreign counterparts and the related ministries and agencies of Ukraine on the matters of international cooperation
• Supervised the subordinates’ activity on the above mentioned and other issues
01/2005-08/2006
Deputy Chief of Peacekeeping Section, Euro-Atlantic Integration Directorate, General Staff of the Armed Forces of Ukraine (Kyiv)
• Monitored activity of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents and personal
• Took part at the training and rotation of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents and personal
• Provided reconnaissance for the future deployment, took part in the deployment and inspection of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents (Lebanon, Sierra Leone, Kosovo, Liberia)
• Participated in the different level talks on the peacekeeping issues
• Provided the higher commanders with the analytical materials
• Conducted correspondence with the related ministries and agencies of Ukraine as well as with the UN DPKO and NATO on the matters of peacekeeping
12/2003-12/2004
Liaison Officer, US CENTCOM (Tampa, Fl, USA)
• Monitored the situation in the area of responsibility
• Coordinated the rotation of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingent in Iraq, evacuation of wounded in action and killed in action
• Participated in the briefings and other US CENTCOM coalition’s events
• Provided the higher commanders with the analytical information and recommendations
08/2000-11/2003
Senior Officer, Peacekeeping Section, Euro-Atlantic Cooperation Directorate, General Staff of the Armed Forces of Ukraine (Kyiv)
• Monitored activity of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents and personal
• Took part at the conducting of the rotation of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents and personal
• Took part at the conducting of the deployment and inspections of the Ukrainian peacekeeping contingents
• Participated in the different level talks on the peacekeeping issues
07/1996-06/2000
Senior Officer, Treaty Implementation Analytical Section, Strategic Offence Arms Treaty Implementation Centre, 43rd Rocket Army (Kyiv)
• Monitored the fulfillment of the Treaty and related agreements
• Provided the higher commander with the analytical materials
• Organized working meeting with the officers of the US On-Site Inspection Agency, foreign (US and German) contractors and representatives from the related ministries and agencies of Ukraine
• Carried out customs clearance of import of the goods within the Cooperative Threat Reduction Program
01/1993-08/1994
Psychologist, Signal Centre, Air Forces of Ukraine (Vinnitsa)
• Did psychological research of the personnel
• Provided the higher commander with the recommendations
07/1986-12/1992
Different engineer positions, Space Launching Site Baykonur (Leninsk, Kazakhstan)
• Provided maintenance of electronic equipment
• Supervised duty technical shifts
Other skills:
Languages: Ukrainian and Russian – native languages;
English and German – fluent;
French – intermediate (French Institute in Kyiv).
Computer: Technically proficient in MS Word, Excel and PowerPoint.
Driving license: B Category.
Additional Information:
Personal qualities: honesty, responsibility, sociability, efficiency, high working capacity, leadership.
Hobbies: sports, theater, travelling, culture, politics.
Abroad trips experience: during my military and civilian career I travelled numerous times to the USA, Canada and almost all European countries, as well as some Asian (Kazakhstan, Lebanon, India, Israel, Pakistan and Iraq) and some African countries (Sierra-Leone and Liberia).
Похожие кандидаты
-
Юрисконсульт
Киев, Удаленно -
Юрист, головний юрисконсульт
30000 грн, Киев -
Юрист
Киев -
Помічник юриста
Киев -
Юрист-международник
Киев -
Юрисконсульт, кейс-менеджер
50000 грн, Киев, Черкассы